Committees: S.231 — 105th Congress (1997-1998)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Energy and Natural Resources01/29/1997 Referred to
06/11/1997 Markup by
06/26/1997 Reported by S. Rept. 105-37
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Historic Preservation and Recreation01/30/1997 Referred to
05/21/1997 Hearings by
House Resources07/15/1997 Referred to
03/25/1998 Markup by
04/28/1998 Reported by H. Rept. 105-496
House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands07/17/1997 Referred to
03/25/1998 Discharged from