There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to require the Secretary of Energy to submit to Congress a plan to ensure that all amounts accrued on the books of the United States Enrichment Corporation for the disposition of depleted uranium hexafluoride will be used to treat and recycle depleted uranium hexafluoride.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
07/21/1998Became Public Law No: 105-204. (TXT | PDF)
07/21/1998Signed by President.
07/21/1998Presented to President.
07/20/1998Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.
07/16/1998Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
07/15/1998Introduced in Senate

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
07/21/1998Became Public Law No: 105-204. (TXT | PDF)
07/21/1998Signed by President.
07/21/1998SenatePresented to President.
07/20/1998-6:24pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/20/1998-6:24pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection.
07/20/1998-6:23pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H5915-5916)
07/20/1998-6:23pmHouseMr. Whitfield asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
07/17/1998-2:13pmHouseHeld at the desk.
07/17/1998SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/17/1998-9:01amHouseReceived in the House.
07/16/1998SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
07/16/1998SenateS.Amdt.3211 Amendment SP 3211 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
07/16/1998SenateS.Amdt.3211 Proposed by Senator Bond for Senator Ford. To express the sense of the Senate that sufficient funds are made available to implement a cleanup plan to be developed by the Secretary of Energy.
07/16/1998SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S8421-8423)
07/16/1998SenateRead the Second Time.
07/15/1998SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
07/15/1998SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S8251-8253)

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 07/15/1998
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 07/16/1998
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 07/17/1998

Committees (0)

As of 05/21/2019 text has not been received for S.2316 - A bill to require the Secretary of Energy to submit to Congress a plan to ensure that all amounts accrued on the books of the United States Enrichment Corporation for the disposition of depleted uranium hexafluoride will be used to treat and recycle depleted uranium hexafluoride.

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.2316. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (07/16/1998)

Instructs the Secretary of Energy to prepare for mandatory inclusion in the President's budget request for FY 2000 a plan and proposed legislation to ensure that all amounts accrued on the books of the United States Enrichment Corporation (USEC) for the disposition of depleted uranium hexafluoride will be used to commence construction and operate an onsite facility at each of the gaseous diffusion plants at Paducah Kentucky, and Portsmouth, Ohio, to treat and recycle depleted uranium hexafluoride consistent with the National Environmental Policy Act.

Prohibits such amounts from being withdrawn from either the USEC Fund or the Working Capital Account until one year after the date on which the President submits the FY 2000 budget request to the Congress.

Expresses the sense of the Senate that the Congress should authorize appropriations during FY 2000 sufficient to fully fund the Secretary's plan.