Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 07/28/1998
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 07/28/1998
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 07/28/1998
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID]* 07/28/1998
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 07/28/1998
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 07/28/1998
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 07/28/1998
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 07/28/1998
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 07/28/1998
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 07/28/1998
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 07/28/1998
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 07/28/1998
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 07/31/1998
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 07/31/1998
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 09/01/1998
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 09/01/1998
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 09/01/1998
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 09/01/1998
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 09/01/1998
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 09/01/1998
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 09/08/1998
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/08/1998
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/08/1998
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 09/08/1998
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 09/08/1998
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 09/08/1998
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/08/1998
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 09/08/1998
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 09/08/1998
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 09/08/1998
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 09/08/1998
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 09/10/1998
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 09/14/1998
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 09/15/1998
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 09/15/1998
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 09/16/1998
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 09/16/1998
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 09/17/1998
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 09/17/1998
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 09/22/1998
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 09/22/1998
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 09/22/1998
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/23/1998
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 09/28/1998
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/28/1998
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 09/28/1998
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 09/30/1998
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 09/30/1998
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 09/30/1998
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 09/30/1998
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 09/30/1998
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 10/01/1998
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 10/01/1998
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 10/02/1998
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 10/05/1998
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 10/05/1998
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 10/06/1998
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 10/07/1998
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 10/07/1998
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 10/07/1998
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 10/08/1998