Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 07/31/1998
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 07/31/1998
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 09/11/1998
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 09/11/1998
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 09/22/1998
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 09/22/1998
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 09/22/1998
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 10/01/1998
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 10/01/1998
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 10/02/1998
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 10/05/1998
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 10/05/1998
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 10/07/1998
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 10/15/1998