Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 09/02/1998
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 09/02/1998
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE]* 09/02/1998
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 09/02/1998
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 09/02/1998
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 09/02/1998
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 09/02/1998
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN]* 09/02/1998
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 09/03/1998
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 09/09/1998
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 09/10/1998
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 09/10/1998
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 09/10/1998
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 09/15/1998
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 09/15/1998
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 09/17/1998
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 09/22/1998
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 09/25/1998
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 09/29/1998
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/29/1998
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 09/30/1998