Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 09/17/1998
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 09/17/1998
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 09/17/1998
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 09/17/1998
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 09/24/1998
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/24/1998
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 09/30/1998
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 10/02/1998
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 10/09/1998
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 10/09/1998