There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to direct the Secretary of the Interior to convey title to the Tunnison Lab Hagerman Field Station in Gooding County, Idaho, to the University of Idaho.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
11/02/1998Became Public Law No: 105-346. (TXT | PDF)
11/02/1998Signed by President.
10/21/1998Presented to President.
10/09/1998Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
10/05/1998Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S11511)
09/28/1998Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported to Senate by Senator Chafee with an amendment. With written report No. 105-354.
09/21/1998Introduced in Senate

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
11/02/1998Became Public Law No: 105-346. (TXT | PDF)
11/02/1998Signed by President.
10/21/1998SenatePresented to President.
10/09/1998-7:54pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/09/1998-7:54pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
10/09/1998-7:49pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
10/09/1998-7:49pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10337-10339)
10/09/1998-7:48pmHouseMr. Saxton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
10/06/1998HouseReferred to the House Committee on Resources.
10/06/1998SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/06/1998-9:01amHouseReceived in the House.
10/05/1998SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S11511)
09/28/1998SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 663.
09/28/1998SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Reported to Senate by Senator Chafee with an amendment. With written report No. 105-354.
09/23/1998SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
09/21/1998SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID]* 09/21/1998

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Environment and Public Works09/21/1998 Referred to
09/23/1998 Markup by
09/28/1998 Reported by S. Rept. 105-354
House Resources10/06/1998 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.2505.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.2505. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (10/05/1998)

Directs the Secretary of the Interior to convey the Tunnison Lab Hagerman Field Station and site in Gooding County, Idaho, excluding water rights and necessary access and utility easements and rights-of-way, to the University of Idaho for use for fish research.

Requires the University to: (1) comply with the National Historic Preservation Act for all ground disturbing activities; and (2) protect prehistoric and historic resources in accordance with the archeological Resources Protection Act of 1979.