Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH]* 02/05/1997
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 02/05/1997
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 02/05/1997
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 02/05/1997
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 02/05/1997
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 02/05/1997
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 02/05/1997
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 02/05/1997
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 02/05/1997
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 02/05/1997
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 02/05/1997
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 02/05/1997
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 02/05/1997
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 02/05/1997
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR]* 02/05/1997
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 02/05/1997
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 02/05/1997
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 02/05/1997
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 02/05/1997
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 02/05/1997
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 02/05/1997
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 02/10/1997
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 02/12/1997
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 02/13/1997
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 02/13/1997
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 02/24/1997
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 02/27/1997
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/05/1997
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 03/13/1997
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 04/14/1997
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 04/24/1997
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 04/29/1997
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 05/08/1997
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 05/08/1997
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 05/16/1997
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/03/1997
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 10/09/1997
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 10/20/1997
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 10/20/1997
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 10/23/1997
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 10/27/1997
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 11/06/1997
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 11/07/1997
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 11/07/1997
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 11/12/1997
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 02/12/1998
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 04/01/1998
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 04/27/1998
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO] 05/06/1998
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 05/11/1998
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 06/11/1998
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 06/15/1998
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/25/1998
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 07/15/1998
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 07/22/1998