Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV]* 02/12/1997
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 02/12/1997
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 02/12/1997
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 02/24/1997
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 02/24/1997
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 03/03/1997
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 03/10/1997
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 03/10/1997
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 03/14/1997
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/17/1997
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 03/20/1997
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 04/24/1997
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/19/1997