Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 02/13/1997
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI]* 02/13/1997
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 02/13/1997
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 02/13/1997
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE]* 02/13/1997
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 02/13/1997
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 02/13/1997
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 02/13/1997
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL]* 02/13/1997
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 02/13/1997
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 02/13/1997
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 07/29/1997
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 07/30/1997
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 07/30/1997
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 07/30/1997
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 07/30/1997
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 09/10/1997
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 01/27/1998