Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 04/16/1997
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/16/1997
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 02/12/1998
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 04/27/1998
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 04/27/1998
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 04/27/1998
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 04/27/1998
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 06/10/1998
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 07/15/1998
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 09/16/1998
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 09/21/1998