There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Children's Protection from Violent Programming Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Children's Protection from Violent Programming Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Communications Act of 1934 to require that violent video programming is limited to broadcast after the hours when children are reasonably likely to comprise a substantial portion of the audience, unless it is specifically rated on the basis of its violent content so that it is blockable by electronic means specifically on the basis of that content.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
09/25/1997Committee on Commerce. Reported to Senate by Senator McCain with amendments. With written report No. 105-89.
02/26/1997Introduced in Senate

All Actions (5)

Date
09/25/1997Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 182.
Action By: Senate
09/25/1997Committee on Commerce. Reported to Senate by Senator McCain with amendments. With written report No. 105-89.
05/01/1997Committee on Commerce. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
02/26/1997Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
Action By: Senate
02/26/1997Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S1670-1671)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 02/26/1997
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 02/26/1997
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 02/28/1997
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 06/16/1997

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation02/26/1997 Referred to
05/01/1997 Markup by
09/25/1997 Reported by S. Rept. 105-89

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.363. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (09/25/1997)

Children's Protection from Violent Programming Act - Amends the Communications Act of 1934 to make it unlawful for any person to distribute to the public any violent video programming not blockable by electronic means specifically on the basis of its violent content during hours when children are reasonably likely to comprise a substantial portion of the audience.

Requires the Federal Communications Commission (FCC) to promulgate regulations to implement this Act. Authorizes the FCC, as part of its rulemaking proceeding, to exempt programming (including news programs and sporting events) whose distribution does not conflict with the objective of protecting children from the negative influences of violent video programming. Exempts premium and pay-per-view cable programming.

Requires the FCC to immediately revoke the license of any person who repeatedly violates this Act and to consider, in its review of an application for a renewal of a license, whether the licensee has complied with this Act.

Directs the FCC to: (1) assess the effectiveness of measures taken by this Act; and (2) report assessment findings to specified congressional committees.