Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 02/27/1997
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 02/27/1997
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY]* 02/27/1997
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 02/27/1997
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 02/27/1997
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH]* 02/27/1997
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 02/27/1997
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 02/27/1997
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 02/27/1997
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 02/27/1997
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 02/27/1997
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 03/10/1997
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 03/10/1997
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 03/10/1997
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 03/12/1997
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/12/1997
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 04/14/1997
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 04/14/1997
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 04/14/1997
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 04/14/1997
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 04/22/1997
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 04/29/1997
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 05/15/1997
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 06/05/1997
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 10/20/1997
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 02/04/1998
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 02/04/1998
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 02/04/1998
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 02/24/1998
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 02/24/1998
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 04/21/1998
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/05/1998
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 06/02/1998
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/12/1998
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 07/28/1998
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/14/1998
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO] 10/01/1998
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 10/01/1998