Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 01/21/1997
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 01/21/1997
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK]* 01/21/1997
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 01/21/1997
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 01/21/1997
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 01/21/1997
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 01/21/1997
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 01/21/1997
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 01/21/1997
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 01/21/1997
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 01/21/1997
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 01/21/1997
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC]* 01/21/1997
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX]* 01/21/1997
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN]* 01/21/1997
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 01/21/1997
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 01/21/1997
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 01/21/1997
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 01/21/1997
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR]* 01/21/1997
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 01/21/1997
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 01/21/1997
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 01/21/1997
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 01/21/1997
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 01/21/1997
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 01/21/1997
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA]* 01/21/1997
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 01/21/1997
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 01/22/1997
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 01/22/1997
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 01/28/1997
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 01/30/1997
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 02/04/1997
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 02/12/1997
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 03/06/1997
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 04/09/1997
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 04/09/1997
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 04/09/1997
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 05/07/1997
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 05/07/1997
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 05/08/1997
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 10/06/1997