There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Birth Defects Prevention Act of 1998

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Birth Defects Prevention Act of 1997

Short Titles as Introduced

Birth Defects Prevention Act of 1997

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide surveillance, research, and services aimed at prevention of birth defects, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
04/21/1998Became Public Law No: 105-168. (TXT | PDF)
04/21/1998Signed by President.
04/17/1998Presented to President.
03/10/1998Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 405 - 2 (Roll no. 42).
06/12/1997Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
06/12/1997Senate Committee on Labor and Human Resources discharged by Unanimous Consent.
03/11/1997Introduced in Senate

All Actions (22)

Date Chamber
04/21/1998Became Public Law No: 105-168. (TXT | PDF)
04/21/1998Signed by President.
04/17/1998SenatePresented to President.
03/10/1998-5:42pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/10/1998-5:42pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 405 - 2 (Roll no. 42).
03/10/1998-5:34pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business.
03/10/1998-4:48pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 5, rule I, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
03/10/1998-4:27pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
03/10/1998-4:27pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H920-925)
03/10/1998-4:26pmHouseMr. Bilirakis moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
07/14/1997HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Commerce
06/17/1997HouseReferred to the House Committee on Commerce.
06/16/1997-2:19pmHouseHeld at the desk.
06/16/1997SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/16/1997-12:01pmHouseReceived in the House.
06/12/1997SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
06/12/1997SenateS.Amdt.371 Amendment SP 371 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
06/12/1997SenateS.Amdt.371 Proposed by Senator Bond. To provide a complete substitute.
06/12/1997SenateMeasure laid before Senate. (consideration: CR S5584-5589)
06/12/1997SenateSenate Committee on Labor and Human Resources discharged by Unanimous Consent.
03/11/1997SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Labor and Human Resources.
03/11/1997SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S2129-2131)

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Labor and Human Resources03/11/1997 Referred to
06/12/1997 Discharged from
House Commerce06/17/1997 Referred to
House Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment07/14/1997 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.419. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (06/12/1997)

Birth Defects Prevention Act of 1997 - Amends the Public Health Service Act to direct the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS), acting through the Director of the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, to carry out programs to: (1) collect and analyze, and make available data on birth defects in a manner that facilitates compliance with this Act, including data on the causes of such defects and on the incidence and prevalence of such defects; (2) operate regional centers for the conduct of applied epidemiological research on the prevention of such defects; and (3) provide information and education to the public on the prevention of such defects. Requires the Secretary, in collecting, analyzing, and making available data on birth defects, to: (1) collect and analyze data by gender and by racial and ethnic group; (2) collect such data from birth and death certificates, hospital records, and such other sources as the Secretary determines to be appropriate; and (3) encourage States to establish or improve programs for the collection and analysis of epidemiological data on birth defects and to make the data available.

Directs the Secretary to establish a National Information Clearinghouse on Birth Defects to collect and disseminate to health professionals and the public information on birth defects, including the prevention of such defects.

Authorizes the Secretary, in carrying out programs regarding birth defects, to make grants to and enter into contracts with public and nonprofit private entities. Authorizes the Secretary, upon the request of a recipient of an award of a grant or contract, to provide supplies, equipment, and services for the purpose of aiding the recipient in carrying out the purposes for which the award is made and, for such purposes, to detail to the recipient any HHS officer or employee.

Authorizes the Secretary to make an award of a grant or contract only if an application for the award is submitted to the Secretary and the application is in such form, is made in such manner, and contains such agreements, assurances, and information as the Secretary determines to be necessary to carry out the purposes for which the award is to be made.

Requires the Secretary to report biennially to the House Committee on Commerce and the Senate Committee on Labor and Human Resources regarding birth defects.

Subjects the provisions of this Act to requirements of the Privacy Act. Applies all Federal laws relating to the privacy of information to data and information collected under this Act.

Authorizes appropriations.