Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 03/11/1997
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 03/11/1997
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR]* 03/11/1997
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 03/11/1997
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 03/11/1997
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 03/11/1997
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 03/11/1997
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 03/11/1997
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 03/11/1997
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 03/11/1997
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 03/11/1997
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 03/11/1997
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE]* 03/11/1997
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC]* 03/11/1997
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL]* 03/11/1997
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 03/11/1997
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 03/11/1997
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/13/1997
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 03/13/1997
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 03/17/1997
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/17/1997
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 03/17/1997
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 04/07/1997
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 04/08/1997
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 04/17/1997
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 04/22/1997
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 05/05/1997
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 05/15/1997
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 05/21/1997
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 06/10/1997
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/10/1997
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 06/11/1997
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 06/12/1997
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 06/12/1997