Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 03/13/1997
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 05/15/1997
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 05/15/1997
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 05/15/1997
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/15/1997
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO] 07/24/1997
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 09/10/1997
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 02/10/1998
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/17/1998
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 05/21/1998