Committees: S.459 — 105th Congress (1997-1998)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Indian Affairs03/18/1997 Referred to
04/22/1997 Hearings by
04/29/1997 Markup by
05/21/1997 Reported by S. Rept. 105-20
House Resources09/30/1997 Referred to
10/22/1997 Markup by
House Education and the Workforce10/30/1997 Re-Referred to
10/09/1998 Discharged from