Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 03/19/1997
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 03/19/1997
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ]* 03/19/1997
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 03/19/1997
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 03/19/1997
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 03/19/1997
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 03/19/1997
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 03/19/1997
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 03/19/1997
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 06/05/1997
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 06/19/1997
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 07/09/1997
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 04/30/1998
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 05/20/1998
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/18/1998
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 09/10/1998

Show cosponsors who withdrew