Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC]* 03/20/1997
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 04/16/1997
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 04/16/1997
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 04/16/1997
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 04/16/1997
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 04/16/1997
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 04/16/1997
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 04/16/1997
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 04/16/1997
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 04/16/1997
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 04/16/1997
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 04/16/1997
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 04/22/1997
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 05/08/1997
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 05/08/1997
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 05/13/1997
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 06/26/1997
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 10/09/1997
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 11/10/1997
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 01/27/1998
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 01/28/1998
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 01/28/1998
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 02/02/1998
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 02/23/1998
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 04/20/1998
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 04/22/1998