Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 04/09/1997
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 04/10/1997
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 04/14/1997
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 04/14/1997
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 04/14/1997
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 04/14/1997
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 04/14/1997
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 04/15/1997
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 04/16/1997
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 04/16/1997
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 04/16/1997
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 04/23/1997
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 04/23/1997
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 04/23/1997
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 04/25/1997
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 04/28/1997
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 04/29/1997
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 04/29/1997
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 05/08/1997
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 05/15/1997
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 05/21/1997
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO] 05/22/1997
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 05/22/1997