There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Curt Flood Act of 1998

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Curt Flood Act of 1998

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Curt Flood Act of 1997

Short Titles as Introduced

Curt Flood Act of 1997

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to require the general application of the antitrust laws to major league baseball, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
10/27/1998Became Public Law No: 105-297. (TXT | PDF)
10/27/1998Signed by President.
10/15/1998Presented to President.
10/07/1998Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
07/30/1998Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
10/29/1997Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Hatch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 105-118. Minority views filed.
01/21/1997Introduced in Senate

All Actions (22)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/27/1998Became Public Law No: 105-297. (TXT | PDF)
10/27/1998Signed by President.
10/15/1998SenatePresented to President.
10/07/1998-10:01pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/07/1998-10:01pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
10/07/1998-9:44pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
10/07/1998-9:44pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9942-9946)
10/07/1998-9:44pmHouseMr. Hyde moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
07/31/1998HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
07/31/1998SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/31/1998-1:01pmHouseReceived in the House.
07/30/1998SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
07/30/1998SenateThe committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent.
07/30/1998SenateS.Amdt.3479 Amendment SP 3479 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
07/30/1998SenateS.Amdt.3479 Proposed by Senator Jeffords for Senator Hatch. In the nature of a substitute.
07/30/1998SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S9494-9498)
10/29/1997SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 231.
10/29/1997SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Hatch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 105-118. Minority views filed.
07/31/1997SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
06/17/1997SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 105-102.
01/21/1997SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
01/21/1997SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S418-419)

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 01/21/1997
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 01/21/1997
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 01/21/1997

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Judiciary01/21/1997 Referred to
06/17/1997 Hearings by
07/31/1997 Markup by
10/29/1997 Reported by S. Rept. 105-118
House Judiciary07/31/1998 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.53.


Subjects (11)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.53. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (07/30/1998)

Curt Flood Act of 1998 - Amends the Clayton Act to declare that the antitrust laws apply to the conduct, acts, practices, or agreements (conduct) of persons in the business of organized professional major league baseball relating to or affecting employment of major league baseball players to play baseball at the major league level to the same extent that such laws apply to such conduct of any other professional sports business affecting interstate commerce.

Grants standing to sue under this Act only to a major league baseball player, as defined by this Act.

Specifies that in cases involving conduct that directly relates to or affects both employment of major league baseball players to play baseball at the major league level and any other aspect of organized professional baseball, only those components, portions, or aspects of such conduct that directly relate to or affect employment of major league baseball players to play baseball at the major league level may be challenged under this Act.