There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to transfer the Dillon Ranger District in the Arapaho National Forest to the White River National Forest in the State of Colorado.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
11/12/1997Became Public Law No: 105-77. (TXT | PDF)
11/12/1997Signed by President.
11/05/1997Presented to President.
11/04/1997Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
10/09/1997Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S10780)
10/06/1997Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 105-99.
04/16/1997Introduced in Senate

All Actions (22)

Date Chamber
11/12/1997Became Public Law No: 105-77. (TXT | PDF)
11/12/1997Signed by President.
11/05/1997SenatePresented to President.
11/04/1997-10:38pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/04/1997-10:38pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
11/04/1997-10:37pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business.
11/04/1997-4:12pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Faleomavaega objected to the Yea - Nay vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
11/04/1997-4:10pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
11/04/1997-4:10pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9926-9927, H9984)
11/04/1997-4:09pmHouseMrs. Chenoweth moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
10/21/1997-1:02pmHouseHeld at the desk.
10/21/1997SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/21/1997-10:31amHouseReceived in the House.
10/09/1997SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S10780)
10/06/1997SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 194.
10/06/1997SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 105-99.
09/30/1997SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources requested executive comment from Department of Agriculture and Office of Management and Budget.
09/24/1997SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. Amendment incorporates provisions of H.R.1020.
06/18/1997SenateSubcommittee on Forests and Public Lands. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 105-158.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Forests and Public Land Management
04/17/1997SenateReferred to Subcommittee on Forests and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
04/16/1997SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
04/16/1997SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S3269-3270)

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 06/24/1997

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Energy and Natural Resources04/16/1997 Referred to
09/24/1997 Markup by
10/06/1997 Reported by S. Rept. 105-99
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Forests and Public Land Management04/17/1997 Referred to
06/18/1997 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.591. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (10/09/1997)

Adjusts the boundary of: (1) the White River National Forest, Colorado, to include all National Forest System lands located in Summit County, Colorado, comprising the Dillon Ranger District of the Arapaho National Forest; and (2) the Arapaho National Forest to exclude such land.

Deems any reference to the Dillon Ranger District, Arapaho National Forest, to be a reference to the Dillon Ranger District, White River National Forest.

Requires the distribution of receipts from such Forests to affected county governments to be based upon the boundaries that existed before the enactment of this Act.