Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 04/22/1997
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 04/22/1997
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA]* 04/22/1997
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN]* 04/22/1997
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 04/30/1997
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 06/18/1997
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 07/31/1997
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 03/11/1998
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 07/13/1998