Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 04/22/1997
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 04/22/1997
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 04/22/1997
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 04/22/1997
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 04/22/1997
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 04/25/1997
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 05/01/1997
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 05/20/1997
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/11/1997
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 09/29/1997
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 11/06/1997