Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO]* 04/24/1997
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 04/24/1997
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 04/24/1997
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 04/29/1997
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 05/14/1997
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 05/21/1997
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 06/23/1997
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 07/28/1997
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 09/15/1997
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 09/26/1997