There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to designate the Federal building courthouse at Public Square and Superior Avenue in Cleveland, Ohio, as the "Howard M. Metzenbaum United States Courthouse".


Actions Overview (7)

Date
12/01/1997Became Public Law No: 105-123. (TXT | PDF)
12/01/1997Signed by President.
11/20/1997Presented to President.
11/13/1997Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
07/25/1997Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8158)
06/26/1997Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported to Senate by Senator Chafee without amendment. Without written report.
06/05/1997Introduced in Senate

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber
12/01/1997Became Public Law No: 105-123. (TXT | PDF)
12/01/1997Signed by President.
11/20/1997SenatePresented to President.
11/13/1997-10:24pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/13/1997-10:24pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
11/13/1997-10:24pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10943-10944)
09/29/1997-2:08pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Crapo objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
09/29/1997-2:04pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
09/29/1997-2:04pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8091)
09/29/1997-2:03pmHouseMr. Kim moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
08/11/1997HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Public Buildings and Economic Development.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
07/28/1997HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
07/28/1997SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/28/1997-12:29pmHouseReceived in the House.
07/25/1997SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8158)
06/26/1997SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 99.
06/26/1997SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Reported to Senate by Senator Chafee without amendment. Without written report.
06/26/1997SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
06/05/1997SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
06/05/1997SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S5345)

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 06/05/1997
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH]* 06/05/1997
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 06/05/1997

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Environment and Public Works06/05/1997 Referred to
06/26/1997 Markup by
06/26/1997 Reported by
House Transportation and Infrastructure07/28/1997 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Public Buildings and Economic Development08/11/1997 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.833.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.833. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (06/05/1997)

Designates the Federal building courthouse at Public Square and Superior Avenue in Cleveland, Ohio, as the Howard M. Metzenbaum United States Courthouse.