Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 06/05/1997
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA]* 06/05/1997
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 06/05/1997
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 06/05/1997
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO]* 06/05/1997
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 06/16/1997
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 06/19/1997
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 09/04/1997
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 10/03/1997
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 01/27/1998
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 02/02/1998