Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH]* 06/09/1997
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 06/09/1997
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ]* 06/09/1997
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/24/1997
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 10/27/1997
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 10/27/1997
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 10/29/1997
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 10/29/1997
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 02/12/1998
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 05/04/1998