Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY]* 06/09/1997
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 06/11/1997
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 06/16/1997
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 06/19/1997
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/26/1997
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 07/08/1997
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 07/08/1997
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 07/16/1997
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 07/22/1997
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 07/31/1997
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 09/03/1997
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/03/1997
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 09/08/1997
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 09/08/1997
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 09/12/1997
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 09/12/1997
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 09/16/1997
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 09/16/1997
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 09/17/1997
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 09/18/1997
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 09/24/1997
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/25/1997
Sen. Thompson, Fred [R-TN] 09/30/1997
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 10/03/1997
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 10/03/1997
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 10/06/1997
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 10/09/1997
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 10/20/1997
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 10/29/1997
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 10/29/1997
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 11/12/1997
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 11/13/1997
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 04/21/1998
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 04/29/1998
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 05/12/1998
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 05/22/1998
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 05/22/1998
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 06/02/1998
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 06/04/1998
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 06/04/1998
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 06/09/1998
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 06/09/1998
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 06/11/1998
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 06/11/1998
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 06/12/1998
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 06/15/1998
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 06/23/1998
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 07/16/1998
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 07/17/1998
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 07/23/1998
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 07/23/1998
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 07/29/1998
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 08/31/1998
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 08/31/1998
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 09/16/1998
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 09/17/1998
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 10/01/1998