Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 06/24/1997
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 06/24/1997
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 06/24/1997
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 07/08/1997
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO] 07/29/1997
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 09/10/1997
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 11/03/1997
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 11/10/1997