Text: S.985 — 105th Congress (1997-1998)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 105-162 (03/09/1998)

 
[105th Congress Public Law 162]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]


<DOC>
[DOCID: f:publ162.105]


[[Page 112 STAT. 29]]

Public Law 105-162
105th Congress

                                 An Act


 
To designate the post office located at 194 Ward Street in Paterson, New 
 Jersey, as the ``Larry Doby Post Office''. <<NOTE: Mar. 9, 1998 -  [S. 
                                 985]>> 

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. FINDINGS.

    Congress finds the following:
            (1) Larry Eugene Doby was born in Camden, South Carolina, on 
        December 12, 1923, and moved to Paterson, New Jersey, in 1938.
            (2) After playing the 1946 season in the Negro League for 
        the Newark Eagles, Larry Doby's contract was purchased by the 
        Cleveland Indians of the American League on July 3, 1947.
            (3) On July 5, 1947, Larry Doby became the first African-
        American to play in the American League.
            (4) Larry Doby played in the American League for 13 years, 
        appearing in 1,533 games and batting .283, with 253 home runs 
        and 969 runs batted in.
            (5) Larry Doby was voted to 7 all-star teams, led the 
        American League in home runs twice, and played in 2 World 
        Series. He was the first African-American to play in the World 
        Series and to hit a home run in a World Series game, both in 
        1948.
            (6) After his stellar playing career ended, Larry Doby 
        continued to make a significant contribution to his community. 
        He has been a pioneer in the cause of civil rights and has 
        received honorary doctorate degrees from Long Island University, 
        Princeton University, and Fairfield University.

SEC. 2. DESIGNATION OF LARRY DOBY POST OFFICE.

    (a) In General.--The post office located at 194 Ward Street in 
Paterson, New Jersey, shall be known and designated as the ``Larry Doby 
Post Office''.

[[Page 112 STAT. 30]]

    (b) References.--Any reference in a law, map, regulation, document, 
paper, or other record of the United States to the post office referred 
to in subsection (a) shall be deemed to be a reference to the ``Larry 
Doby Post Office''.

    Approved March 9, 1998.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--S. 985:
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

CONGRESSIONAL RECORD:
                                                        Vol. 143 (1997):
                                    Oct. 9, considered and passed 
                                        Senate.
                                                        Vol. 144 (1998):
                                    Feb. 24, considered and passed 
                                        House.

                                  <all>