Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 06/10/1998
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 06/10/1998
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 06/10/1998
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 06/10/1998
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 06/10/1998
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 06/17/1998
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 07/07/1998
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 07/07/1998
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 07/15/1998
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 07/23/1998
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 09/11/1998