Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 03/13/1997
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 03/13/1997
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 03/13/1997
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 03/19/1997
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/19/1997
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 03/19/1997
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 03/19/1997
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 03/20/1997
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/20/1997
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 03/20/1997
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/20/1997
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 03/20/1997
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 03/20/1997
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 03/20/1997
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 03/20/1997
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 03/20/1997
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 04/07/1997
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 04/07/1997
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 04/07/1997
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 04/08/1997