Text: S.Con.Res.18 — 105th Congress (1997-1998)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

  • TXT
  • PDF (PDF provides a complete and accurate display of this text.) Tip?

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (03/20/1997)

 
[Congressional Bills 105th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[S. Con. Res. 18 Introduced in Senate (IS)]







105th CONGRESS
  1st Session
S. CON. RES. 18

 Recognizing March 25, 1997, as the anniversary of the Proclamation of 
  Belarusan independence, and calling on the Government of Belarus to 
             respect fundamental freedoms and human rights.


_______________________________________________________________________


                   IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

                             March 20, 1997

 Mr. Lautenberg (for himself and Mr. D'Amato) submitted the following 
 concurrent resolution; which was referred to the Committee on Foreign 
                               Relations

_______________________________________________________________________

                         CONCURRENT RESOLUTION


 
 Recognizing March 25, 1997, as the anniversary of the Proclamation of 
  Belarusan independence, and calling on the Government of Belarus to 
             respect fundamental freedoms and human rights.

Whereas the seedlings of an independent and democratic Belarus, for which 
        generations of Belarusan patriots have fought and died, are in danger of 
        being swept away as a result of the policies of Belarusan President 
        Alaksandr Lukashenka and the efforts of Russian nationalist leaders to 
        recreate the Soviet empire;
Whereas March 25th is the date that Belarusans throughout the world salute the 
        sacrifices and bravery of the members of the Council of the Belarusan 
        Democratic Republic, who in 1918 liberated their country from czarist 
        rule;
Whereas the Russian Duma in March 1996 voted to declare void the 1991 agreement 
        dissolving the Soviet Union;
Whereas the referendum adopted in November of 1996 expanded President 
        Lukashenka's already considerable powers in violation of the 
        Constitution of Belarus and basic democratic principles;
Whereas on January 16, 1996, the Chairman-in-Office of the Organization for the 
        Security and Cooperation of Europe urged the Government of Belarus ``to 
        enter into dialogue with the opposition and to ensure freedom of media 
        and not restrict access to the media for members of the opposition'';
Whereas on March 14, 1997, the United States Department of State issued a 
        statement that calls on President Lukashenka's Government to exercise 
        restraint and to observe the international human rights agreements to 
        which it is a party; and
Whereas the Government of President Lukashenka has monopolized the mass media, 
        undermined the constitutional foundation for the separation of powers, 
        suppressed the freedom of the press, undermined efforts to restore the 
        Belarusan language, and undercut the ground for all-Belarusan unity: 
        Now, therefore, be it
    Resolved by the Senate (the House of Representatives concurring), 
That it is the sense of Congress that the President should urge 
President Lukashenka and the Government of Belarus to--
            (1) abide by the provisions of--
                    (A) the Helsinki Final Act; and
                    (B) other agreements of the Organization for the 
                Security and Cooperation of Europe;
            (2) guarantee human rights and fundamental freedoms, 
        including freedom of the press, assembly, and expression; and
            (3) guarantee separation of powers.

SEC. 2. SUPPORT OF INDEPENDENCE.

    It is the policy of the United States to support the people of 
Belarus in--
            (1) maintaining independent statehood;
            (2) promoting the rule of law, human rights, and 
        fundamental freedoms; and
            (3) assuring that Belarus has the opportunity to survive as 
        an equal and full-fledged member-state among the sovereign 
        nations of the world.
                                 <all>