There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A concurrent resolution congratulating the residents of Jerusalem and the people of Israel on the thirtieth anniversary of the reunification of that historic city, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
05/20/1997Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S4776)
05/08/1997Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported to Senate by Senator Helms without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
04/16/1997Introduced in Senate

All Actions (9)

Date Chamber
05/21/1997HouseReferred to the House Committee on International Relations.
05/21/1997SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/21/1997-10:33amHouseReceived in the House.
05/20/1997SenateResolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4776)
05/08/1997SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 51.
05/08/1997SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported to Senate by Senator Helms without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Relations
05/08/1997SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Relations
04/16/1997SenateReferred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
04/16/1997SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S3295)

Cosponsors (90)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 04/16/1997
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 04/16/1997
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 04/16/1997
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Thompson, Fred [R-TN]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 04/29/1997
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 04/29/1997
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 04/29/1997
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 04/29/1997
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 04/29/1997
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 04/29/1997
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 05/06/1997
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/07/1997
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 05/07/1997
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 05/07/1997
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 05/07/1997
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 05/08/1997
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 05/08/1997
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 05/08/1997
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/08/1997
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 05/12/1997
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 05/13/1997
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 05/13/1997
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 05/14/1997
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 05/20/1997
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 05/22/1997
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 06/09/1997
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 06/09/1997

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations04/16/1997 Referred to
05/08/1997 Markup by
05/08/1997 Reported by
House International Relations05/21/1997 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (14)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.Con.Res.21. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (04/16/1997)

Congratulates the residents of Jerusalem and the people of Israel on the 30th anniversary of the reunification of that city.

Calls upon the President and the Secretary of State to publicly affirm as a matter of U.S. policy that Jerusalem must remain the undivided capital of Israel.

Urges U.S. officials to refrain from any actions that contradict U.S. law on this subject.