Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 04/16/1997
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 04/16/1997
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 04/16/1997
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Thompson, Fred [R-TN]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 04/16/1997
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 04/29/1997
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 04/29/1997
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 04/29/1997
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 04/29/1997
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 04/29/1997
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 04/29/1997
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 05/06/1997
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/07/1997
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 05/07/1997
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 05/07/1997
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 05/07/1997
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 05/08/1997
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 05/08/1997
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 05/08/1997
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/08/1997
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 05/12/1997
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 05/13/1997
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 05/13/1997
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 05/14/1997
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 05/20/1997
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 05/22/1997
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 06/09/1997
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 06/09/1997