Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 05/23/1997
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 07/07/1997
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 07/16/1997
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 07/21/1997
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 07/21/1997
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 07/22/1997
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 07/23/1997
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 07/24/1997
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 07/24/1997
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 07/30/1997
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 09/02/1997
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 09/02/1997
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 09/02/1997
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 09/02/1997
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 09/02/1997
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 09/05/1997
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 09/05/1997
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 09/15/1997
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 10/01/1997
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 10/01/1997
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 10/07/1997
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 11/04/1997
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 11/05/1997
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 01/27/1998
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 01/27/1998
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 02/11/1998
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 02/23/1998
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 02/23/1998
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 02/25/1998
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 02/26/1998
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 03/02/1998
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/11/1998
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 03/16/1998
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 03/17/1998
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 03/26/1998
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/31/1998
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 04/01/1998
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 04/28/1998
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 05/19/1998