Summary: S.Con.Res.3 — 105th Congress (1997-1998)All Information (Except Text)

There is one summary for S.Con.Res.3. Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (01/07/1997)

Provides for a recess or adjournment of the Senate on January 9, 1997, until January 21, 1997, and an adjournment of the House of Representatives on: (1) January 9, 1997, until January 20, 1997; (2) January 20, 1997, until January 21, 1997; and (3) January 21, 1997, until February 4, 1997.