Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 07/31/1997
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 07/31/1997
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 07/31/1997
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO]* 07/31/1997
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 07/31/1997
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 07/31/1997
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 07/31/1997
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 07/31/1997
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 07/31/1997
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 07/31/1997
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 07/31/1997
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/25/1997
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 09/25/1997
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 09/25/1997
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 09/25/1997
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 09/25/1997
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 09/25/1997
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 09/25/1997
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 09/25/1997
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 09/25/1997
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 09/25/1997
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 09/25/1997
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/25/1997
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 09/25/1997
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 09/25/1997
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 09/25/1997
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 09/25/1997
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 09/25/1997
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 09/25/1997
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 09/25/1997
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 09/25/1997
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 09/25/1997
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 09/29/1997
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 09/29/1997
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 10/01/1997
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 10/20/1997
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 10/21/1997
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 10/21/1997
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 11/06/1997