Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 09/08/1997
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 09/08/1997
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 09/08/1997
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 09/08/1997
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 09/08/1997
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 09/08/1997
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 09/08/1997
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/08/1997
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 09/08/1997
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 09/08/1997
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 09/08/1997
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 09/09/1997
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 09/09/1997
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/10/1997
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 09/10/1997
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/10/1997
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 09/30/1997
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 04/02/1998