Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 03/13/1997
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 03/13/1997
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 03/13/1997
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 03/20/1997
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/20/1997
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 03/20/1997
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 03/20/1997
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 03/20/1997
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/09/1997
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 04/09/1997
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 04/09/1997
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 04/09/1997
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 04/09/1997
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 04/23/1997
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 04/23/1997
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 05/08/1997
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 05/14/1997
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/10/1997
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 09/15/1997