There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A concurrent resolution expressing the sense of Congress that the European Union is unfairly restricting the importation of United States agriculture products and the elimination of such restrictions should be a top priority in trade negotiations with the European Union.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
05/21/1998Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
05/21/1998Senate Committee on Finance discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S5356)
02/10/1998Introduced in Senate

All Actions (8)

Date Chamber
05/29/1998HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
05/22/1998HouseReferred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
05/22/1998SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/22/1998-9:04amHouseReceived in the House.
05/21/1998SenateResolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
05/21/1998SenateSenate Committee on Finance discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5356)
02/10/1998SenateReferred to the Committee on Finance.
02/10/1998SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S587-588)

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 02/10/1998
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 03/12/1998
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 03/23/1998

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Finance02/10/1998 Referred to
05/21/1998 Discharged from
House Ways and Means05/22/1998 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Trade05/29/1998 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.Con.Res.73. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (02/10/1998)

Expresses the sense of the Congress that: (1) the European Union unfairly restricts the importation of U.S. agricultural products; (2) the elimination of such restrictions should be a top priority of any current or future trade negotiations between the United States and the European Union; and (3) the U.S. Trade Representative should not engage in any trade negotiations with the European Union that undermine U.S. ability to achieve such elimination.