Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 02/11/1998
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 03/23/1998
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 03/23/1998
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/23/1998
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/23/1998
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 03/23/1998
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/23/1998
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 03/23/1998
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 03/23/1998
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 03/31/1998
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 03/31/1998
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 03/31/1998
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 03/31/1998
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/23/1998
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 04/23/1998
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 04/23/1998
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 04/23/1998
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 04/23/1998
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 04/23/1998
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 04/23/1998
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/23/1998
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 04/23/1998
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 04/23/1998
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 04/30/1998
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 04/30/1998
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 04/30/1998
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 04/30/1998
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 04/30/1998
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/30/1998
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 04/30/1998
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 04/30/1998
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 04/30/1998
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 04/30/1998
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/30/1998
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/30/1998
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 04/30/1998
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 04/30/1998
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 05/06/1998
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/06/1998
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/06/1998
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 05/06/1998
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 05/06/1998
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 05/06/1998
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 05/06/1998
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 05/06/1998
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 05/06/1998
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 05/06/1998
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 05/06/1998
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 05/06/1998
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 05/06/1998
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 05/07/1998
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 05/07/1998