There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A concurrent resolution remembering the life of George Washington and his contributions to the Nation.


Actions Overview (5)

Date
10/15/1998Passed/agreed to in House: On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote.
10/15/1998Committee on Government Reform discharged.
10/09/1998Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S12252)
10/08/1998Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Hatch without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
03/10/1998Introduced in Senate

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
10/16/1998HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Civil Service.
Action By: Committee on Government Reform and Oversight
10/15/1998-5:00pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/15/1998-5:00pmHouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote.
10/15/1998-4:57pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate.
10/15/1998-4:56pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H10970-10971)
10/15/1998-4:56pmHouseMr. Gilman asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
10/15/1998HouseCommittee on Government Reform discharged.
10/10/1998HouseReferred to the House Committee on Government Reform and Oversight.
10/10/1998SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/10/1998-10:02amHouseReceived in the House.
10/09/1998SenateResolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S12252)
10/08/1998SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
10/08/1998SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 712.
10/08/1998SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Hatch without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
03/10/1998SenateReferred to the Committee on Judiciary.
03/10/1998SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S1705)

Cosponsors (57)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA]* 03/10/1998
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 03/10/1998
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 04/28/1998
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 04/28/1998
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 04/28/1998
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 04/28/1998
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 04/28/1998
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 04/28/1998
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 04/28/1998
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/28/1998
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 04/28/1998
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 04/28/1998
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 04/28/1998
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 04/28/1998
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 04/28/1998
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 04/28/1998
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 04/28/1998
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 04/28/1998
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 04/28/1998
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 04/30/1998
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 04/30/1998
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 06/02/1998
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 06/02/1998
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 06/02/1998
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 06/02/1998
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/02/1998
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 06/02/1998
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 06/02/1998
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 06/02/1998
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 06/02/1998
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 07/30/1998
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/30/1998
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 07/30/1998
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 07/30/1998
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 07/30/1998
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 07/30/1998
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 09/25/1998
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 09/28/1998
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 09/28/1998
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 09/28/1998
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 09/28/1998
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 09/28/1998
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 09/28/1998
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 09/28/1998
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 09/28/1998
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 09/29/1998
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 09/29/1998
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 09/29/1998
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 09/29/1998
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/30/1998
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 09/30/1998
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 09/30/1998
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 09/30/1998
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO] 09/30/1998
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 09/30/1998
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 10/01/1998
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 10/06/1998

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary03/10/1998 Referred to
10/08/1998 Markup by
10/08/1998 Reported by
House Government Reform and Oversight10/10/1998 Referred to
10/15/1998 Discharged from
House Government Reform Subcommittee on Civil Service10/16/1998 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.Con.Res.83.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.Con.Res.83. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (03/10/1998)

Calls for commemoration of the death of George Washington.