Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 04/02/1998
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO]* 04/02/1998
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 04/02/1998
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 05/04/1998
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 05/04/1998
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 05/04/1998
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 05/04/1998
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 05/04/1998
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 05/04/1998
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 05/08/1998
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 05/08/1998
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 05/11/1998
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 05/12/1998
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 05/12/1998
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 05/22/1998
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 05/22/1998
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/23/1998

Show cosponsors who withdrew