Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 05/18/1998
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 05/18/1998
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 05/18/1998
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/21/1998
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 05/22/1998
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/25/1998
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 07/13/1998
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 07/17/1998