There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Popular Titles

Family Planning bill (Identified by CRS)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution affirming certain findings of the President of the United States with regard to programs concerning international family planning.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
02/10/1997Senate Committee on Appropriations discharged.
02/04/1997Introduced in Senate

All Actions (4)

Date
03/06/1997Indefinitely postponed by Senate by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2033)
Action By: Senate
02/10/1997Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 15.
Action By: Senate
02/10/1997Senate Committee on Appropriations discharged.
Action By: Senate
02/04/1997Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations for not to exceed five calendar days pursuant to section 518 A (d) of Public Law 104-208.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 02/04/1997

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Appropriations02/04/1997 Referred to
02/10/1997 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.J.Res.14. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (02/04/1997)

Approves the presidential finding submitted to the Congress on January 31, 1997, that the prohibition on the obligation or expenditure of foreign assistance funds for population planning activities or other population assistance before July 1, 1997, imposed by provisions of the Foreign Operations, Export Financing, and Related Programs Appropriations Act, 1997 is having a negative impact on the proper functioning of the population planning program.