Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 02/27/1997
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 02/27/1997
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV]* 02/27/1997
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 02/27/1997
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 02/27/1997
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 02/27/1997
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 02/27/1997
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 02/27/1997
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 02/27/1997
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 03/03/1997
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 03/04/1997
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 03/13/1997
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 03/18/1997
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 04/14/1997