Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 03/20/1997
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA]* 03/20/1997
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL]* 03/20/1997
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 03/20/1997
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 03/20/1997
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 03/20/1997
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 03/20/1997
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 03/20/1997
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 03/20/1997
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 03/20/1997
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 03/20/1997
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 03/20/1997
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 03/20/1997
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 03/20/1997
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 04/07/1997
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 04/09/1997
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 05/16/1997
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/26/1997